+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0099
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 3, 2003
On June 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-038-002
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 23, 2003
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 16, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 013-003-000
On April 8, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 034-024-001
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 18, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 6, 2003
- Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-001-000
On March 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
On February 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On January 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Dan Cronin
On January 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Cronin
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that a law enforcement officer may not search or inspect a motor vehicle, its contents, the driver, or a passenger solely because the driver or passenger is not wearing a seat safety belt. Adds an immediate effective date.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 625 ILCS 5/12-603.1 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 12-603.1
- 725 ILCS 5/108-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 108-1
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2003: SB0050 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 20, 2003
April 3, 2003: SB0050 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 03, 2003
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor