+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to Financial Institutions
- Re-referred to Rules
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Debbie DeFrancesco Halvorson
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor