+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; 015-000-000
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Susana Mendoza
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 18, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2003
- Do Pass Education; 010-000-000
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/21-1 - from Ch. 122, par. 21-1
+ − Vote
March 20, 2003: SB0492 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 20, 2003
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor