+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Labor & Commerce
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Labor & Commerce
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
+ − Statute Amended
- 820 ILCS 405/611 - from Ch. 48, par. 441