+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Debbie DeFrancesco Halvorson
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor