+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (51)
On August 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0306
- Effective Date August 9, 2019
- Governor Approved
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 006-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2019
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 017-000-000
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Collins
- Recalled to Second Reading
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-001-000
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Criminal Law
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
- Second Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Repeals a Cyber Gang Unit pilot program created in the Lake County Metropolitan Enforcement Group and the Cook County Sheriff's Office. Repeals provision in the Higher Education Student Assistance Act concerning a forensic science grant program.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends provisions of the Criminal Identification Act regarding a pilot program to waive fees in Cook County for filing certain petitions to expunge or seal records. Changes the date on which the program becomes inoperative from January 1, 2019 to January 1, 2021. Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 20 ILCS 1115/1 - from Ch. 96 1/2, par. 7601
- 20 ILCS 2630/5.2 -
- 20 ILCS 2605/2605-580 rep. -
- 110 ILCS 947/65.80 rep. -
+ − Votes (8)
May 31, 2019: HFA0001 - Concurrence
May 28, 2019: HFA0001 - Criminal Law
May 26, 2019: SB0482 - Third Reading
May 23, 2019: HFA0001 - Judiciary - Criminal
April 30, 2019: SB0482 - Judiciary - Criminal
April 4, 2019: SB0482 - Third Reading
March 19, 2019: SFA0001 - Criminal Law
March 6, 2019: SB0482 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor