+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0068
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Governor Approved
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Civil Committee; 015-000-000
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
- Arrived in House
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 22, 2021
- Second Reading
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
- Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman
+ − Statutes Amended (17)
+ − Votes (4)
May 26, 2021: SB0047 - Third Reading
May 12, 2021: SB0047 - Judiciary - Civil
April 23, 2021: SB0047 - Third Reading
April 13, 2021: SB0047 - Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor