+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 020-004-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Labor & Commerce Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Motion Prevailed
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Remains in Labor & Commerce Committee
- Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Labor & Commerce Committee; 010-009-003
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Silvana Tabares
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Mike Smiddy
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 030-016-001
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 009-001-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Clayborne
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2015
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
- Sponsor Removed Sen. William Delgado
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2015
- Do Pass Labor; 011-004-000
- Assigned to Labor
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Prefiled with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 002
Provides that a day and temporary labor service agency shall keep records with respect to each person who applies in person to become a day or temporary laborer rather than with respect to each person.
House Amendment 001
Excludes from the term "day or temporary labor applicant" a natural person who requests a job through an online application process.
Senate Amendment 001
Removes changes from the Section concerning legislative findings. Relocates certain provisions of the introduced bill. Provides that the records shall be open to inspection by the Department of Human Rights. Deletes language providing that at the time of annual registration, the day and temporary labor service agency shall submit to the Department of Labor, on a form created by the Department, a report containing the information required by the new provisions, grouped by branch office, in the aggregate for all day or temporary laborers assigned within this State in the prior year.