+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On August 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0529
- Effective Date August 14, 2003
- Governor Approved
On June 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 086-000-029
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Fiscal Note Filed
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 012-000-000
On May 7, 2003 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. William B. Black
On May 5, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Insurance Committee
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 31, 2003
On April 9, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On April 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Maloney
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Health & Human Services; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
On April 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney
On March 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 009-000-000
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Health & Human Services
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Provides that the inhalants must be medically appropriate.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 215 ILCS 5/356z.4 new -
- 215 ILCS 125/5-3 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1411.2
- 215 ILCS 165/10 - from Ch. 32, par. 604
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2003: SB0467 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 20, 2003
April 3, 2003: SB0467 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 03, 2003
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor