+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On October 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0657
- Effective Date October 10, 2007
On October 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Amendatory Veto Overridden Both Houses
On October 10, 2007 in the House:
- Override Amendatory Veto - House Passed 111-001-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On October 5, 2007 in the House:
- Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Elaine Nekritz
On October 4, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 10, 2007
On October 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 2, 2007
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Susan Garrett
- Override Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 052-002-000
On August 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Governor Amendatory Veto
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 21, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 9, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 8, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Environmental Health Committee; 009-000-000
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Environmental Health Committee
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elaine Nekritz
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On February 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 23, 2007
- Do Pass Environment and Energy; 013-000-000
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Environment and Energy
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (4)
October 10, 2007: SB0046 - Motion - Wednesday, October 10, 2007
October 2, 2007: SB0046 - Motion - Tuesday, October 02, 2007
May 22, 2007: SB0046 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 22, 2007
February 23, 2007: SB0046 - Third Reading - Friday, February 23, 2007
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor