+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On January 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
On July 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2018
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Assignments
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
- Second Reading
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
- Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton