+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to Health
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Health
- Reported Back To Health; 003-001-000
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Managed Care Organizations (MCO's)
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 16, 2021: SB0455 - Sub. on Managed Care Organizations
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor