+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0149
- Effective Date October 1, 2005
- Governor Approved
On June 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 4, 2005 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 3, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 28, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On April 5, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On March 3, 2005 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 2, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2005
- Second Reading
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 17, 2005
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On January 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Statute Amended
- 725 ILCS 225/5 - from Ch. 60, par. 22