+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On July 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
On May 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2016
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Assignments
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015
- Second Reading
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 40 ILCS 5/1-101.1 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 1-101.1
+ − Vote
March 25, 2015: SB0442 - Executive - Mar 25, 2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor