+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (56)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On June 1, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 23, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2003
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as amended by House Amendment No. 1
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- Home Rule Note Filed as amended by House Amendment No. 1
- Correctional Note Filed as amended by House Amendment No. 1
- State Debt Impact Note Filed as amended by House Amendment No. 1
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as amended by House Amendment No. 1
- Balanced Budget Note Filed as amended by House Amendment No. 1
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 23, 2003
- Pension Note Filed as amended by House Amendment No. 1
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- Pension Note Requested by Rep. Julie Hamos; as amended by House Amendment No. 1
- Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Julie Hamos; as amended by House Amendment No. 1
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Julie Hamos; as amended by House Amendment No. 1
- Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Julie Hamos; as amended by House Amendment No. 1
- Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Julie Hamos; as amended by House Amendment No. 1
- State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Kurt M. Granberg; as amended by House Amendment No. 1
- Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Kurt M. Granberg; as amended by House Amended No. 1
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as amended by House Amendment No. 1
- Fiscal Note Filed as amended by House Amendment No. 1
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- Judicial Note Filed as amended by House Amendment No. 1
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rosemary Kurtz
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Mary K. O'Brien; as amended by House Amendment No. 1
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Mary K. O'Brien; as amended by House Amendment No. 1
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Mary K. O'Brien; as amended by House Amendment No. 1
On May 1, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 017-001-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On March 25, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
On March 24, 2003 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On March 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Silverstein
- Recalled to Second Reading
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Rules
On February 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 6, 2003
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
On January 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On January 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Collection Agency Act. Provides that the prohibited fees and charges includes "costs".
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Collection Agency Act. Provides that the prohibited fees and charges includes "costs".
+ − Statute Amended
- 225 ILCS 425/2.04 - from Ch. 111, par. 2005.1
+ − Vote
March 24, 2003: SB0044 - Third Reading - Monday, March 24, 2003
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor