+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Rules
- Motion Prevailed
- Motion Filed Sen. Louis S. Viverito; , Cullerton, Hendon, Petka and Roskam, Motion to Re-refer, pursuant to Senate Rule 3-7. Re-referred to the Senate Rules Committee.
On March 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 6, 2005
- Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On March 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On March 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Predator Accountability Act. Contains a short title only.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -