+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (62)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0886
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2017
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 048-003-001
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 048-003-001
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 27, 2016
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-040-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-003-001
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Esther Golar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 007-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 009-002-000
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 048-006-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2015
- Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-001-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Prefiled with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the bill as engrossed with the following changes: In provisions concerning health care worker licensure actions and sex crimes, provides that a health care worker that has been convicted of a forcible felony, other than a forcible felony requiring registration under the Sex Offender Registration Act or involuntary sexual servitude of a minor that is a forcible felony, and the health care worker has had his or her license revoked, the health care worker may petition the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to restore his or her license if more than 5 years have passed since the conviction or more than 3 years have passed since the health care worker's release from confinement for that conviction, whichever is later. Provides that the Department may also consider other evidence of rehabilitation, along with any voluntary remedial actions taken by the health care worker, when determining whether a license shall be restored. Makes other changes.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the engrossed bill with the following changes: Amends the Health Care Worker Background Check Act. Provides that no health care employer shall knowingly hire, employ, or retain any individual in a position with certain health care related duties who have been convicted of committing or attempting to commit offenses concerning the manufacture, delivery, or possession with intent to deliver or manufacture cannabis in excess of 10 grams (rather than any amount of cannabis). In provisions of the Act concerning fingerprint-based criminal history records check, provides that if an applicant or employee has a waiver for one or more disqualifying offenses pursuant to the Act and he or she is otherwise eligible to work, the Department of Public Health shall report that the applicant or employee is eligible to work, and shall not report information regarding the waiver or list the specific disqualifying offenses, if any. Makes similar changes to provisions concerning waiver. Provides that upon inquiry of a health care employer, the Department shall inform the inquiring party if a waiver is pending. Provides that the Department shall (rather than must) act upon a waiver request within 30 days. Makes other changes.
Senate Amendment 001
Requires that the conviction for the forcible felony occur more than 5 years before the date the petition is filed.