+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On August 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0417
- Effective Date January 1, 2012
- Governor Approved
On June 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-051-000
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 005-002-000
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee
On April 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-001-000
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 10, 2011
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Garrett
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 009-000-000
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 17, 2011
- Do Pass Local Government; 007-000-000
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Illinois Highway Code. Removes the requirement that the highway commissioner of each road district that may provide for the collection, transport, and disposal of brush and leaves must do so in accordance with the local guidelines of only those townships or counties that regulate by ordinance open burning of brush or leaves.