+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (53)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0462
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2004
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-001
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-001
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Judiciary; 010-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Judiciary; 010-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Postponed Judiciary
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Postponed Judiciary
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02 - May 23, 2003
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,02
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-018-002
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 23, 2003
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Judiciary; 010-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Schoenberg
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2003
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
- Postponed - Judiciary
- Postponed - Judiciary
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Exempts from the definition of "personal information" court records, information found in publicly available sources, and any other information that is not known to concern a child. Provides that the Act shall not be construed as providing any private right of action. Deletes the changes to the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Businesses Practices Act.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Exempts from the definition of "personal information" court records, information found in publicly available sources, and any other information that is not known to concern a child. Provides that the Act shall not be construed as providing any private right of action. Deletes the changes to the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Businesses Practices Act.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Reinserts the provisions of the bill as introduced with the following changes: Defines "child", and "personal information". Provides that information brokers and solicitors must, upon the request of a parent, step-parent, or legal guardian, cease to broker, solicit, or facilitate the sale of personal information concerning that person's child. Provides that a violation of the Act is a violation of the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act (instead of a Class A misdemeanor), and amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act to make corresponding changes. Makes other technical changes.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -