+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Executive
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Executive
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 675/1 - from Ch. 23, par. 2357
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor