+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On August 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0211
- Effective Date January 1, 2020
- Governor Approved
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- To Family Law Subcommittee
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Murphy
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura M. Murphy
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
- Second Reading
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Uniform Child-Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act. Provides that if a party states in the pleading or the affidavit that disclosure of an address would risk abuse or harm to the party or a family member, the address may be omitted from documents filed with the court. Provides that a party is not required to include in the pleading or affidavit a domestic violence safe house address or an address changed as a result of a protective order.