+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On April 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10(e) to December 31, 2003.
On April 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10(e) to April 9, 2003.
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
On March 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 008-005-000
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 605 ILCS 10/3 - from Ch. 121, par. 100-3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor