+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0867
- Effective Date May 13, 2022
- Governor Approved
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2022
- Second Reading
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022
- Do Pass Education; 011-000-000
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2022: SB3915 - Third Reading
March 16, 2022: SB3915 - Elem Sec Ed: Adm., Lic. & Charter
February 16, 2022: SB3915 - Third Reading
February 8, 2022: SB3915 - Education
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor