+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
- Session Sine Die
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As March 25, 2022
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As March 11, 2022
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022
- Do Pass as Amended Education; 013-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
- Assigned to Education
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Makes changes to the General Assembly's findings. Makes changes concerning the support offered by the State Board of Education to a public school district to select evidence-based core reading instruction programs and implement them. Makes changes concerning the support offered by the State Board of Education to each early childhood, elementary, and special education teacher, reading specialist, literacy coach, higher education faculty member, and administrator to complete evidence-based training in teaching reading, including creation of a tool that school districts and the public may use to evaluate professional development and training programs (instead of the creation of an advisory list of rigorous professional development programs). Further amends the School Code. Requires that, before October 1, 2023, the State Board of Education, in consultation with the State Educator Preparation and Licensure Board, review and, as needed, amend its professional licensure standards to align with the principles of evidence-based literacy instruction. Makes changes to the amendatory provisions concerning educator testing, including requiring that applicants seeking specified licenses pass a test in reading foundations after October 1, 2025. Makes changes concerning the minimum requirements for educators trained in other states or countries, including providing that applicants must complete coursework concerning evidence-based methods of reading that include explicit and repeated focus on phonemic awareness, a systematic approach to phonics (decoding), spelling instruction (encoding), vocabulary development, including morphology, reading fluency, oral language development, and reading comprehension, including syntax and background (content) knowledge. Effective immediately.