+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2021
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2021
- Second Reading
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2021
- Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Vote
March 17, 2021: SB0039 - Executive
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor