+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On July 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 9, 2016
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Assignments
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015
- Second Reading
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
- Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 65 ILCS 5/1-1-1 - from Ch. 24, par. 1-1-1
+ − Vote
March 25, 2015: SB0387 - Executive - Mar 25, 2015
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor