+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
- Session Sine Die
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2010
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 15, 2010
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2010
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Steans
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 009-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather Steans
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As March 26, 2010
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2010
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 4, 2010
- Do Pass Public Health; 010-000-000
- Assigned to Public Health
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather Steans
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the contents of the bill as introduced with the following changes. Makes changes to the findings. Makes changes to the definitions of "delegated care aide", "diabetes care plan", and "principal" and defines "health care provider". Provides that a diabetes care plan must be signed by a student's parent or guardian and submitted to the school for any student with diabetes who seeks assistance with diabetes care in the school setting, unless the student has been managing his or her diabetes care in the school setting before the effective date of the Act, in which case the student's parent or guardian may sign and submit a diabetes care plan under the Act (instead of requiring the diabetes care plan to be signed and submitted by a parent or guardian). Makes changes concerning what the diabetes care plan must include. Provides that parents are responsible for informing the school in a timely manner of any changes to the diabetes care plan and their emergency contact numbers. Provides that the principal shall facilitate compliance with the provisions of a diabetes care plan during all school-sponsored activities (instead of ensuring that the school has at least one delegated care aide present and available at the school). Provides that, in schools that have a student with diabetes, all school employees must receive certain training in the basics of diabetes care. Makes changes concerning diabetes care plans, training, assistance to delegated care aides, the duties of a delegated care aide, self-management, protection against retaliation, and civil immunity. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- New Act -
- 105 ILCS 5/10-22.21b - from Ch. 122, par. 10-22.21b
- 30 ILCS 805/8.34 new -