+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On January 9, 2023 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
On January 6, 2023 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
On January 5, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-005-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-001-000
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2022
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Do Pass as Amended Executive; 016-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2022
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Provides that from January 1, 2023 through January 1, 2025 (rather than January 1, 2028), the Department of Agriculture shall not issue any new transporting licenses.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
January 5, 2023: SB3799 - Executive
February 16, 2022: SB3799 - Third Reading
February 9, 2022: SB3799 - Executive
February 9, 2022: SCA0001 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor