+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0859
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2023
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-000-000
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael Kelly
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
- First Reading
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022
- Second Reading
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022
- Do Pass Transportation; 016-000-000
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 625 ILCS 5/11-605 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-605
- 625 ILCS 5/11-1414 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-1414