+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020
On April 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020
On April 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020
On April 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020
On April 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On March 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 225 ILCS 15/7 - from Ch. 111, par. 5357
- 225 ILCS 15/7.1 new -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor