+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (50)
On August 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0369
- Effective Date August 23, 2007
- Governor Approved
On June 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
On May 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Pensions and Investments; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Pensions and Investments; 009-000-000
On May 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Pensions and Investments
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Pensions and Investments
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,04-May 3, 2007
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01,04
On May 1, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 086-030-000
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Robert S. Molaro
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert S. Molaro
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert S. Molaro
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert S. Molaro
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 005-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel and Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Personnel and Pensions Committee
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On March 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2007
- Second Reading
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2007
- Do Pass Pensions and Investments; 010-000-000
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Pensions and Investments
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Amends the Cook County and Cook County Forest Preserve Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Allows a person who meets specified criteria to elect to receive a one-time lump sum retirement cancellation payment equal to the amount of his or her contributions to the Fund on the date of termination, with regular interest, multiplied by 1.5. Provides that a person who receives an alternative cancellation payment forfeits the right to any other benefits. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 40 ILCS 5/15-106 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 15-106
- 40 ILCS 5/15-107 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 15-107