+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- To Unemployment Insurance
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
+ − Statute Amended
- 820 ILCS 405/612 - from Ch. 48, par. 442
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor