+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments
- Re-referred to Assignments
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2012
- Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 35 ILCS 105/3-5 -
- 35 ILCS 105/3-85 -
- 35 ILCS 110/2 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.32
- 35 ILCS 110/3-5 -
- 35 ILCS 110/3-70 -
- 35 ILCS 115/2 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.102
- 35 ILCS 115/3-5 -
- 35 ILCS 120/2-5 -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor