+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0278
- Effective Date August 17, 2007
- Governor Approved
On June 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 21, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 17, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On April 9, 2007 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 30, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2007
- Second Reading
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2007
- Do Pass Judiciary Criminal Law; 007-000-000
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary Criminal Law
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Randall M. Hultgren
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2007: SB0364 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 22, 2007
March 29, 2007: SB0364 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 29, 2007
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor