+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 30, 2012
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- To Pensions & Investments Subcommittee on Pension Enhancements
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Pensions and Investments
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 40 ILCS 5/17-142.1 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 17-142.1
- 30 ILCS 805/8.36 new -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor