+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2012
On May 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
On May 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Lauzen
On May 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2012
On May 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2012
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to Revenue
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 30, 2012
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- To Revenue Subcommittee on Property Taxes
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Lauzen
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor