+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2007
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2007
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
- Third Reading - Passed; 049-004-003
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2007
- Second Reading
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
On March 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2007
- Do Pass as Amended Environment and Energy; 011-000-000
On March 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Environment and Energy
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Environment and Energy
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Environment and Energy
On March 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment and Energy
On March 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Held in Environment and Energy
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Environment and Energy
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -