+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018
- Do Pass Higher Education; 010-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education
On May 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to Higher Education
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Higher Education
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose