+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Firearms
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 5 ILCS 140/7.5 -
- 20 ILCS 2610/24 new -
- 430 ILCS 65/3 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-3
- 430 ILCS 65/8 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-8
- 720 ILCS 5/24-1.9 new -
- 720 ILCS 5/24-1.10 new -
- 720 ILCS 5/24-3A -
- 720 ILCS 5/24-4.2 new -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor