+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1008
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2015
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 26, 2014 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-035-000
On May 23, 2014 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 014-000-000
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2014
- Second Reading
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2014
- Do Pass Education; 013-000-000
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/14-7.02 - from Ch. 122, par. 14-7.02
+ − Votes (2)
May 26, 2014: SB3554 - Third Reading - Monday, May 26, 2014
April 1, 2014: SB3554 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 01, 2014
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor