+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
+ − Statute Amended
- 755 ILCS 5/2-4 - from Ch. 110 1/2, par. 2-4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor