+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On June 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On March 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2010
- Second Reading
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010
- Do Pass Pensions and Investments; 006-001-001
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Pensions and Investments
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 40 ILCS 5/17-106 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 17-106
- 40 ILCS 5/17-114 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 17-114
- 40 ILCS 5/17-131 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 17-131
- 40 ILCS 5/17-132 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 17-132
- 40 ILCS 5/17-134 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 17-134
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor