+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor