+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; J. Collins
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Mattie Hunter
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Financial Institutions; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled in Financial Institutions
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled in Financial Institutions
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions
On March 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions
On March 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2012
- Second Reading
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 6, 2012
- Do Pass Financial Institutions; 009-000-000
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Financial Institutions
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 205 ILCS 405/3.1 - from Ch. 17, par. 4805
- 815 ILCS 177/1 -
- 815 ILCS 177/5 -
- 815 ILCS 177/10 -
- 815 ILCS 177/15 -
- 815 ILCS 177/20 new -
- 815 ILCS 177/25 new -
- 815 ILCS 177/30 new -
- 815 ILCS 177/35 new -
- 815 ILCS 505/2NNN new -
+ − Vote
March 28, 2012: SB3523 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 28, 2012
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor