+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 001-002-000; -FAILED
- Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- To Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hunter
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 033-018-001
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-001-001
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
- Second Reading
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 006-003-002
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter