+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (46)
- Session Sine Die
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2010
- Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 8, 2010
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2010
- Assigned to Juvenile Justice Reform Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; E. Jones III
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 15, 2010
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2010
- Second Reading
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As March 26, 2010
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2010
- Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 008-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Criminal Law
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 19, 2010
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
- Postponed - Criminal Law
- Assigned to Criminal Law
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that information identifying victims of aggravated battery, battery, attempted first degree murder, or other non-sexual violent offenses may be disclosed to appropriate school officials by a local law enforcement agency pursuant to an agreement established between the school district and the local law enforcement agency subject to the approval by the presiding judge of the juvenile court for the purpose of preventing foreseeable future violence involving minors.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that information identifying victims of aggravated battery, battery, attempted first degree murder, or other non-sexual violent offenses may be disclosed to appropriate school officials by a local law enforcement agency pursuant to an agreement established between the school district and the local law enforcement agency subject to the approval by the presiding judge of the juvenile court for the purpose of preventing foreseeable future violence involving minors.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 10/6 - from Ch. 122, par. 50-6
- 705 ILCS 405/5-145 -