+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1144
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date December 28, 2012
- Sent to the Governor
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - December 5, 2012
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-014-000
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- 3/5 Vote Required
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 042-000-000
- Passed Both Houses
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-005-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; 010-004-000
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2013
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Schoenberg
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2012
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2012
- Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Adds the Attorney General or his or her designee to the Foundation board. Specifies that the Foundation may make grants to the Department of State Police to accomplish the purposes set forth in the Act. Prohibits the Foundation from accepting funds from, or on behalf of, an incarcerated person, a person with a pending criminal case in a State or federal court, or a person having a familial relationship with such a person.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Adds the Attorney General or his or her designee to the Foundation board. Specifies that the Foundation may make grants to the Department of State Police to accomplish the purposes set forth in the Act. Prohibits the Foundation from accepting funds from, or on behalf of, an incarcerated person, a person with a pending criminal case in a State or federal court, or a person having a familial relationship with such a person.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -