+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/12-603.1 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 12-603.1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor