+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Held in Criminal Law
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Criminal Law
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Criminal Law
On February 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor