+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EN)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Energy
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein